HI SB2626 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to HOU/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to HOU/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a project may not proceed under an emergency proclamation relating to housing or affordable housing if that project includes any construction, development, redevelopment, or adaptive reuse that results in a new luxury housing unit or the conversion of an existing residential unit to a luxury housing unit.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Brenton Awa [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2204 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL/HSG, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2626&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2626_.HTM |