HI SB2632 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fines for violations of the fireworks control law. Authorizes the department of public safety, sheriff division, to inspect shipping containers for explosives and illegal fireworks. Requires DPS, in collaboration with DOD, DOT, and other federal and state agencies, to establish a shipping container inspection program to randomly inspect shipping containers for illegal fireworks and explosives using explosive-sniffing dogs. Requires DOT to assess a fee of $1 on all shipping containers for FY 2016-2017 and a fee of $2 thereafter to fund the program. Establishes the shipping container inspection program special fund. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Department of Public Safety; Sheriff Division; Department of Transportation; Shipping Container Inspection Program; Illegal Fireworks; Explosives; Fees; Penalties; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-16-16 1:50PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-16-16 3:10PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2485 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to PBS/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2632&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2632_.HTM |