HI SB2640 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a section to the Hawaii Revised Statutes which promotes the construction of high density housing within a one-half mile radius of a rail station along the Honolulu rail transit system.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/EET, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EET/HOU, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2640&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2640_.HTM |