HI SB2647 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the allowable loan term for direct loans provided by the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to forty years, instead of thirty years, as currently outlined in section 215 of the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920, as amended. Takes effect on either the date of the Secretary of the Interior's notification that congressional approval of this Act is unnecessary, or on the date of consent by the United States Congress.
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2128) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |