HI SB2653 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Returns $200,000,000 from the funds generated by surcharge on state general excise tax revenues transferred to the city and county of Honolulu to the State general fund. Authorizes issuance of $300,000,000 GO bonds to offset loss of tax revenues to the city and county of Honolulu in fiscal year 2010-2011. Extends surcharge for two years.
Title
County Surcharge Tax; General Obligation Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 2:05pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2653&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2653_.HTM |