HI SB2656 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support additional opportunities for medical residencies and training programs in a partnership between the John A. Burns School of Medicine and the Veterans Administration.
Title
Relating To Medical Education And Training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/HRE, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM . |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
John A. Burns School of Medicine
Medical Residencies and Training
University of Hawaii
Veterans Administration
John A. Burns School of Medicine
Medical Residencies and Training
University of Hawaii
Veterans Administration
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2656&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2656_.HTM |