HI SB2678 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a separate board of dental hygiene to oversee the licensing and regulation of dental hygienists in the State, independent from the board of dental examiners, who regulate licensed dentists. (SD1)
Title
Board of Dental Hygiene; Establishment; Dental Hygienists; Regulation; Licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2071) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1861 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Re-referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4