HI SB2695 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 070, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 070, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a blockchain and cryptocurrency task force. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Cryptocurrency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 070, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 070, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 211-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 211-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Todd, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Misalucha, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 11:15AM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-28 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 926). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Fevella added as Conferee. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-22 11:15AM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Misalucha Chair; Baker, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Todd Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 477). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1831-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1422-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Mizuno. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2022-03-15 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-16-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 299) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2791) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |