HI SB2706 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends certain land subdivision and condominium property regime laws related to agricultural land, as recommended pursuant to Act 278, Session Laws of Hawaii 2019, to ensure condominium property regime projects within the agricultural district are used for agricultural purposes. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 344). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3041) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH/JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2494) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH/JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2602 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).