HI SB2717 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To increase general assistance program efficiency by eliminating the requirement to send a ten-day pending notice requesting additional medical evidence when a determination and certification is made that an applicant does not have a physical, mental, or combination of a physical and mental disability.
Title
General Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-09-10 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 4:00pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2564 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2717&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2717_.htm |