HI SB2719 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to establish full-time equivalent ( .0 FTE) positions within the Employee Classification and Compensation Division of the Department of Human Resources Development to perform employee classification duties. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Human Resources Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |