HI SB2724 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that development, construction, renovation, and maintenance on public land or financed based on public land are public works subject to state prevailing wage and hour requirements regardless of the contracting parties or funding source, with limited exemptions for certain housing construction. Appropriates funds for enforcement of wage and hour requirements. (SB2724 HD1)
Title
Public Works; Wages; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-16 9:15AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 704). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Johanson. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, Jordan, McKelvey, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Johanson, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Jordan, Kobayashi, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3). |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1187-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-18-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 238) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2802) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-16 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2366) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-10-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2474 (Same As) 2016-02-02 - Re-referred to WAL, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7