HI SB2747 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a general excise tax exemption for certain food or food ingredients.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2747&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2747_.HTM |