HI SB2747 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends and modifies the task force established to recommend amendments to the Hawaii Revised Statutes to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights to December 31, 2022. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Parentage Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 56) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-22. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2722) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |