HI SB2755 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of special land and development fund moneys to eradicate or mitigate invasive species and install and maintain safety improvements on improved lands that provide lease revenue to the Department of Land and Natural Resources and that have significant cultural or historic value. Appropriates moneys out of the special land and development fund.
Title
Relating To The Special Land And Development Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1955 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Authorized Uses
DLNR
Invasive Species
Safety Improvements
Special Land and Development Fund
Authorized Uses
DLNR
Invasive Species
Safety Improvements
Special Land and Development Fund
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2755&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2755_.HTM |