HI SB276 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds and authorizes staff positions for the Women's Community Correctional Center Hookipa Makai Cottage. Appropriates funds for additional housing and transportation costs of certain inmates sent to Saguaro Correctional Center in Arizona. Relates to the Department of Public Safety budget and appropriates funds for adult corrections officers. (SB276 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 84) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1174) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB276 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
Subjects
Adult Corrections Officers ($)
Appropriation
Budget
Department of Public Safety
Hookipa Makai Cottage
Saguaro Correctional Center
Women's Community Correctional Center
Appropriation
Budget
Department of Public Safety
Hookipa Makai Cottage
Saguaro Correctional Center
Women's Community Correctional Center