HI SB2761 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the imposition of a criminal fine for violations involving aquatic resources. Establishes a tiered administrative fine system for each specimen of aquatic life taken, killed, or injured. Establishes a criminal fine structure on a per-specimen basis for violations involving aquatic life. Authorizes the department of land and natural resources to recommend community service that benefits the resource damaged when a person is ordered to perform community service in lieu of a fine.
Title
Relating To Aquatic Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1653 (Same As) 2022-06-13 - Act 035, on 06/08/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2761&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2761_.HTM |