HI SB2763 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 252, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1355).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 252, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1355).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act to reflect recent changes to federal law and to adjust fees in consideration of the new regulatory requirements. (CD1)
Title
Mortgage Loan Originators; Mortgage Loan Originator Companies; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 252, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1355). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 252, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1355). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pine voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marumoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 75-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 75-12). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Choy, Tsuji, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-12 3:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Taniguchi. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Choy Co-Chairs; Tsuji, Riviere. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 483). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1610-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3). | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1176-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Ching; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Thielen. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-12-12 2:10PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 290) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2580) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2174) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2501 (Same As) 2012-04-20 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-12 10:00AM in conference room 016.