HI SB2766 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development to perform a study to refine rural district policies and make recommendations to facilitate the reclassification of lands from the agricultural district to the rural district. Requires reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Land Use.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Branco Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 647). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1946-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tam, Wildberger; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-17-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 36) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Nishihara). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-22-22. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2702) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2123) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 1:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-22 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1929 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).