HI SB2768 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Hawaii paroling authority to use a continuum of administrative sanctions when a parolee violates a term or condition of parole. (SD2)
Title
Parole; Administrative Sanctions
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-11-10 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 263) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2561) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2194) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, English, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to PSM, JGO. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |