HI SB2768 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Act 076, 5/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Act 076, 5/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes kindergarten mandatory for children who will be at least five years of age on July 31 of the school year, unless otherwise exempt. (CD1)
Title
Kindergarten
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Act 076, 5/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176). |
2014-05-02 | House | Act 076, on 5/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176). |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-25 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 717). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. |
2014-04-25 | House | Deferred one day 04-29-14. |
2014-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday 04-25-14. |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 4-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-25-14. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 4-14). |
2014-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Woodson, Aquino, Awana, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-14 2:15PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Woodson Co-Chairs; Aquino, Awana, Matsumoto Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1051-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Hanohano, Say, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Takai. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-14-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 285) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2819) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-14 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |