HI SB278 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB278
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the microtargeting of political advertisements on television and social media based on online behavioral data, demographic characteristics, and geographic location below the electoral district level.
Title
Relating To Political Advertising.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-23-21 9:40AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB278 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB660 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Re-referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 10
HB660 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Re-referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 10
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=278&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB278_.HTM |