HI SB278 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB278
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain public buildings near mass transit projects and on Hawaiian home lands to display portraits of Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN , referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 114) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB278 (Carry Over) 2023-03-15 - The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.