HI SB2780 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to WLO/AGR, JUD, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to WLO/AGR, JUD, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Protects agriculturally suitable lands on Oahu (lands with productivity ratings of "A" or "B"); provides for mandatory extension of agricultural leases. (SD2)
Title
Agricultural Lands
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to WLO/AGR, JUD, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 269) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Nishihara . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2469) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kidani, Tokuda, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2171) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Takamine, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Bunda. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |