HI SB2782 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act 203, 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act 203, 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Enterprise Technology Services to develop multilingual accessibility standards. Appropriates funds to establish one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) position to develop multilingual accessibility standards within the Office of Enterprise Technology Services. (CD1)
Title
Related To Electronic Information Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Senate | Act 203, 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304). |
2024-07-08 | House | Act 203, on 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 179-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 179-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Matayoshi, Lamosao, M. Mizuno, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 10:02AM; CR 016. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 10:10AM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 774). |
2024-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Perruso, Matayoshi, Lamosao Co-Chairs; M. Mizuno, Garcia. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 710). |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1826-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5). |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported from HET/LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1226-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET/LGO on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HET/LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 202) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2938) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2108 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to HET/LGO, FIN, referral sheet 2