HI SB28 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB28
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to require the State to provide enough housing to meet demand subject to standards and criteria as provided by law.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Ix, Section 5, Of The Hawaii State Constitution, To Require The State To Produce Enough Housing To Meet Demand.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB28 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=28&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB28_.HTM |