HI SB280 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB280
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Education to create temporary positions under certain conditions. Amends the requirement that the Department of Education report the creation of temporary positions to the Department of Budget and Finance by requiring that the report also be sent to the Legislature.
Title
Relating To Direct Instructional Services To Students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB280 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=280&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB280_.HTM |