HI SB2802 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hunters to obtain written permission from landowners or occupiers or holders of private lands to hunt on private lands. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Hunting on Private Lands; Written Permission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 04-05-16 at 2:05 PM in room 325. |
2016-03-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-29-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6). |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Say. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-14-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 254) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2579) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 9:01AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2030) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Wakai. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WLA, JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2273 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 4