HI SB2806 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation for the Small Business Innovation Research Program. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kidani, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 654). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1952-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1197-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-18 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Quinlan, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ohno, Woodson, Yamane. |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 03-18-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 341) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2861) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2022) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Small Business Innovation Research Program
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Small Business Innovation Research Program