HI SB2808 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes rules, regulations, and permitting procedures for transportation network companies operating in the State. Makes permanent insurance requirements for transportation network companies and transportation network drivers. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation Network Companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 377) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2922) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2507) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, CPH. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |