HI SB2815 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (S) Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (S) Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Disability and Communication Access Board (DCAB) to charge fees to defray expenses of reviewing construction plans to ensure compliance with law, establishes a fee schedule to be effective January 1, 2013, and requires the fees to be deposited into the DCAB special fund.
Title
Persons with Disabilities; Disability and Communication Access Board; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2553 (Same As) 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 277, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1380).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2815 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2815_.htm |