HI SB2817 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the University of Hawaii to establish five full-time equivalent (5.0 FTE) faculty positions at the College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii College Of Tropical Agriculture And Human Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5). |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1212-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) M. Mizuno, Quinlan, Todd. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 205) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3041) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2207) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |