HI SB2818 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the membership of the environmental council from 15 to 9 and establishes the environmental review special fund. (SB2818 HD2)
Title
Environmental Protection
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Russell Kokubun [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Marumoto voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Wakai. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-16-10 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Reported from EEP/WLO/EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Takai, Wakai, Wooley. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Har, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Coffman, C. Lee, Luke, Morita, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Herkes, Sagum; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Har, C. Lee, Luke, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Herkes, Sagum; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-11-10 at 11:05am. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLO/EBM on Tuesday, 03-09-10 11:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to EEP/WLO/EBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 282) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Bunda, Hee, Nishihara). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2621) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-10 10:10AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from ENE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Fukunaga, Takamine. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-09-10 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-10-10 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 2/2/2010 2:45:00 PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to ENE/WTL, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |