HI SB2823 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a blue ribbon committee within the Department of the Attorney General to analyze the Hawaii Administrative Rules and identify any rules that are not supported by statutory authority. Requires each state agency to cooperate with the blue ribbon committee. Requires the blue ribbon committee to submit a report to the Legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Administrative Rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2190) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 9:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |