HI SB2832 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the counties may issue traffic infractions for violations of any law prohibiting or restricting the stopping, standing, or parking of vehicles on highways. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Traffic Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1307-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Souza. |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 208) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2943) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2668) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2295 (Same As) 2024-06-24 - Act 065, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166).