HI SB2833 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Waiakea Peninsula Redevelopment District and Waiakea Redevelopment Planning Committee for the redevelopment of public lands on the Waiakea Peninsula. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Waiakea Peninsula Redevelopment.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2383) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 1:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-22 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1788 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.