HI SB2836 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Act 050, 05/10/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Act 050, 05/10/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and appropriates funds for collective bargaining cost items for Collective Bargaining Unit 14 and their excluded counterparts, including the cost of salary adjustments negotiated between the State and the bargaining unit representative for fiscal biennium 20152017. (SB2836 HD2)
Title
Appropriations for Collective Bargaining Cost Items; Bargaining Unit (14) ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Act 050, 05/10/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151). |
2016-05-11 | House | Act 050, on 05/10/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 716). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, K.Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 577). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1665-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6). |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-11-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 73) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2507) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2023) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2307 (Same As) 2016-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.