HI SB2844 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-16 2:14PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-16 2:14PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund for the fiscal year 2014-2015 period. (SB2844 HD1)
Title
Disposition of Excess Revenues; Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-16 2:14PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Johanson, Nishimoto, Pouha. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 580). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1484-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Pouha. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 270) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2365) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2315 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4