HI SB2845 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Act 248, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Act 248, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from selling ammunition to a person under the age of twenty-one. Prohibits a person under the age of twenty-one from owning, possessing, or controlling ammunition, with exceptions. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | Senate | Act 248, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353). |
2024-07-09 | House | Act 248, on 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Gates, Kila, Kong, Pierick, Souza voting no (6) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Gabbard, Richards). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 12-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 12-24). |
2024-04-19 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Holt, Takayama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Rhoads, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Holt, Takayama, Matsumoto. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Elefante. |
2024-04-02 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 355). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 505). |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Lamosao, Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kong, Pierick, Souza voting no (6) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Alcos, Lamosao, Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kila, Kong, Pierick, Souza voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Sayama, Tam excused (9). |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-15 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Miyake, Souza. |
2024-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-15-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 214) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2941) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2653) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1810 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1