HI SB286 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB286
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies a customer has the right to rescind a deferred deposit by returning the principal amount used to fund the deferred deposit within a specified time frame. Permits customers to convert a deferred deposit into an installment loan plan in certain circumstances and specifies requirements for the installment loan plan. Protects against harmful collection practices. Defines annual percentage rate. Requires a check casher to post a notice informing customers that additional options may be available for safe, regulated, lower-cost, small dollar loans. Requires a check casher to provide a written agreement to a customer that clearly discloses specific information relating to the cost and fees associated with the deferred deposit, among other things. Caps the annual percentage rate at thirty-six per cent for deferred deposit of a personal check. Permits prepayment of deferred deposit agreements with no additional fees. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Check Cashing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:05PM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-17. |
2017-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-17-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 113) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 696) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB286 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Annual Percentage Rate
Check Cashing
Collection Practices
Deferred Deposit Agreements
Fees
Installment Loan Plan
Right to Rescind
Check Cashing
Collection Practices
Deferred Deposit Agreements
Fees
Installment Loan Plan
Right to Rescind