HI SB287 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires maximum use of geothermal energy on the island of Hawaii to achieve energy self-sufficiency and reduce reliance on imported fossil fuels. Establishes a pilot program to facilitate the development of infrastructure for the deployment of renewable energy resources, including geothermal resources. (SD2)
Title
Geothermal Energy; Energy Self-Sufficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLO on Tuesday, 03-17-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EEP/WLO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 133) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Hooser, Ige, Ihara, Kidani, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Tokuda . Noes, 5 (Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Kokubun, Takamine, Tsutsui). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Fukunaga, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 252) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Hooser, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Ihara, Kokubun ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-12-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-09 3:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |