HI SB287 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the use of native Hawaiian plants in place of indigenous land plants for certain landscaping projects under the Hawaii public procurement code. Specifies graduated time line for planting by percentage of all plants used. Excludes grass and sod. (SD1)
Title
Procurement; Native Hawaiian Plants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM deferred the measure until 02-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 3:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |