HI SB287 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB287
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes counties to require their approval for condominium projects located in agricultural districts that are greater than ten acres prior to the creation of the condominium property regime. Requires a condominium map to be accompanied by a letter certifying that the condominium property regime will conform to the applicable County's zoning laws. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1581) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/AGR on Wednesday, 03-22-23 11:15AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to WAL/AGR, CPC, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 118) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, CPN. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB287 (Carry Over) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).