HI SB2872 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a 5-year Hale Kokua pilot project under the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to reduce homelessness by incentivizing and assisting private homeowners who set aside existing dwelling units, or construct new or improve existing dwelling units, for rental by families and individuals classified as homeless under the project. Requires interim and final reports to the legislature. Repealed on 7/1/2023. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2339) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2409 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).