HI SB2872 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - Re-Referred to GVO/HOU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - Re-Referred to GVO/HOU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties to regulate by ordinance the use of vehicles, campers, and mobile homes as alternative residential dwellings.
Title
Relating To Counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/HOU, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2872&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2872_.HTM |