HI SB2896 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Effective 1/1/2026 requires each parking lot in the State having public paid parking spaces in the State to accept payment of parking fees by credit card and debit card; and each parking meter in the State that collects parking fees for any public paid parking space to be maintained in working order to accept payment by cash, credit card, and debit card. Requires each county to adopt ordinances to enforce these requirements. Requires each county and the State to submit annual reports. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Parking Spaces.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2589) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 3:03PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to TCA/GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |