HI SB2908 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates general revenues to expand state-run quarantine facilities under the jurisdiction of the department of agriculture's plant quarantine branch.
Title
Relating To The Plant Quarantine Branch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2299) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |