HI SB2910 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals five per cent preference for bidders on public works construction contracts who are party to an apprenticeship agreement.
Title
Procurement; Public Works; Construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee on EGH deferred the measure. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 3:20PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1601 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2910&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2910_.HTM |