HI SB2934 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission to establish community-based renewable energy tariffs that allow electric utility customers to own portions of a renewable energy facility that sells electricity to the electric utility. Allows an electric utility or anyone to propose a community-based renewable energy project for approval by the Public Utilities Commission. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2934 HD1)
Title
Community-based Renewable Energy Program; Public Utilities Commission; Tariff
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:35PM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker, Ige Co-Chairs; Ruderman, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami, Lowen Co-Chairs; Creagan, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 636). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Onishi, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, McDermott, Say voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1646-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Tokioka, Yamashita; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Fale, Hanohano, Ito, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Say voting no (2) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from EEP/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1180-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Belatti, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ito; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, McDermott. |
2014-03-20 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Fale. |
2014-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/CPC on Thursday, 03-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 334) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2636) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported from ENE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-05-14 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |