HI SB2967 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a community food forest program in the Department of Land and Natural Resources that shall work collaboratively with local government and community organizations to provide sources of healthy food statewide. Appropriate funds.
Title
Community Food Forest Program; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2581 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2967&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2967_.HTM |